HB0263

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Civil Actions - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation

Sponsored by:

Delegate Rosenberg

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20161/25/2016First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20163/7/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/8/20163/8/2016Favorable with Amendments {562913/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/11/20163/11/2016Third Reading Passed (138-0)43
Senate3/14/20163/14/2016First Reading Judicial Proceedings43
3/16/20163/16/2016Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20164/8/2016Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:58 P.M.