HB0294 (CH0805)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime

Sponsored by:

Delegate Dumais

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 805


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20171/25/2017First Reading Judiciary
2/9/20172/9/2017Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/14/20173/11/2017Favorable Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed45
3/15/20173/12/2017Third Reading Passed (91-46)46A
Senate3/16/20173/16/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings45
3/30/20173/30/2017Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/30/20173/26/2017Favorable Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed55
3/31/20173/27/2017Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 56
4/4/20173/29/2017Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 58
4/10/20174/2/2017Third Reading Passed (27-17)62
House4/10/20174/3/2017Returned Passed68
Post Passage5/27/20175/27/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 805

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 30, 2017 12:54 P.M.