HB0365 (CH0262)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools - Bullying, Harassment, and Intimidation Policies - Update

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jackson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/28/20161/28/2016First Reading Ways and Means
2/3/20162/3/2016Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20163/16/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments {585066/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/18/20163/16/2016Third Reading Passed (140-0)48
Senate3/21/20163/18/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47A
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20164/7/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/7/20164/1/2016Favorable Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed61A
4/11/20164/3/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)63A
House4/11/20164/5/2016Returned Passed68
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:59 P.M.