HB0591 (CH0442)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation Agreement

Sponsored by:

Delegate Platt

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2/27/20182/27/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2/28/20182/28/2018Favorable with Amendments {416980/1 Report Adopted36
Second Reading Passed with Amendments36
3/2/20183/2/2018Third Reading Passed (136-1)38
Senate3/5/20183/5/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs39
3/30/20183/30/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/20183/27/2018Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)59
House4/3/20183/25/2018Returned Passed59
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.