HB0714 (CH0679)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Plug-In Electric Drive and Hybrid Vehicles

Sponsored by:

Delegate McMillan

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 679


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/31/20181/31/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
3/14/20183/11/2018Favorable Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed45
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (133-5)46
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed (38-8)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 679

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:17 P.M.