HB0793 (CH0543)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Environment - Asbestos Occupation - Training Program and Examination

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hucker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/6/20132/6/2013First Reading Economic Matters
2/8/20132/8/2013Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/13/20133/13/2013Favorable Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed46
3/18/20133/15/2013Third Reading Passed (113-19)48A
Senate3/19/20133/17/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:03 P.M.