HB0860 (CH0647)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013

Sponsored by:

Baltimore City Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20132/7/2013First Reading Appropriations
2/20/20132/20/2013Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {124761/1 Report Adopted50
Floor Committee Amendment {804863/1 Adopted50
Special Order until next session (Delegate Jones) Adopted 50
Special Order until 3/21 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted (123-11) 50A
3/21/20133/18/2013Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {483626/1 Rejected (41-92)51
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {493629/1 Rejected (42-88)51
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {483424/1 Rejected (41-93)51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/22/20133/19/2013Motion Laid Over (Delegate Szeliga)52
Motion to not allow Laid Over (Delegate Haynes) Adopted (94-43)52
Third Reading Passed (107-30)52
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation52
3/25/20133/25/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20133/29/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/29/20133/25/2013Favorable with Amendments {169739/1 Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed with Amendments56
3/29/20133/26/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (40-7)57
House4/2/20133/27/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments60A
Third Reading Passed (102-30)60A
Passed Enrolled60A
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:06 P.M.