HB0941 (CH0410)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - Establishment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Miller, A.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/6/20172/6/2017First Reading Appropriations
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/17/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {274162/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/18/20173/15/2017Third Reading Passed (132-7)49
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings46A
3/30/20173/30/2017Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/30/20173/26/2017Favorable Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed55
4/7/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed (45-0)61
House4/7/20173/31/2017Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:03 P.M.