HB1036

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval

Sponsored by:

Delegate Rey

Status:

In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20172/8/2017First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/17/20173/14/2017Favorable Report Adopted48
Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Lierman) Adopted 48
3/20/20173/16/2017Second Reading Passed50
3/20/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (97-41)51
Senate3/21/20173/19/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings48
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/10/20174/3/2017Floor Amendment {313322/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted (24-23)63A
Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Hough) (30-16)63A
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/10/20174/4/2017Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
Floor Amendment {313322/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted64
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted64
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)64

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 11, 2017 12:05 A.M.