HB1634 (CH0731)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018

Sponsored by:

Delegate Frick

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/15/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments {233198/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/17/20183/13/2018Third Reading Passed (87-46)47A
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {417178/1 Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Floor Amendment {877771/1 Finance63
Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (14-29)63
Floor Amendment {877771/1 Finance Adopted63
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-12)63
House4/7/20183/30/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (93-42)64
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:17 P.M.