HB1782 (CH0037)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Pena-Melnyk

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/28/20182/28/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/20183/5/2018Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
3/7/20183/7/2018Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {226683/1 Report Adopted47
Floor Amendment {443622/1 (Delegate R. Lewis) Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (91-47)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/29/20183/26/2018Favorable with Amendments {277275/1 Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
3/30/20183/27/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (40-6)58
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments61
Third Reading Passed (89-48)61
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 12:59 P.M.