SB0008 (CH0161)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Infrastructure Replacement Surcharge

Sponsored by:

Senator Astle

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate9/18/20129/18/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Finance
1/7/20131/7/2013Hearing 1/23 at 2:30 p.m.
1/30/20131/30/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
1/31/20131/31/2013Favorable with Amendments {867177/116
Laid Over (Senator Astle) Adopted16
2/1/20132/1/2013Favorable with Amendments {867177/117
Committee Amendment Adopted17
Motion Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (21-22)17
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (31-12)17
Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 17
2/5/20132/5/2013Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {293726/1 Rejected (15-29)18
Floor Amendment (Senator Rosapepe) {163725/1 Rejected (19-21)18
Second Reading Passed with Amendments18
2/7/20132/7/2013Third Reading Passed (34-13)20
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Economic Matters23
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed30
2/21/20132/21/2013Third Reading Passed (116-19)32
Senate2/22/20132/22/2013Returned Passed31
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:06 P.M.