SB0009

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights and Required Reports

Sponsored by:

Senator McFadden

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate8/26/20148/26/2014Pre-filed
1/14/20151/14/2015First Reading Finance
1/22/20151/22/2015Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
1/23/20151/23/2015Hearing cancelled
1/28/20151/28/2015Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:46 P.M.