SB0228 (CH0452)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings

Sponsored by:

Senator Salling

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/19/20171/19/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation
1/25/20171/25/2017Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20172/20/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2/21/20172/21/2017Favorable with Amendments {609834/1 Report Adopted28
Second Reading Passed with Amendments28
2/23/20172/23/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)30
House2/24/20172/24/2017First Reading Ways and Means33
3/1/20173/1/2017Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/7/20173/31/2017Third Reading Passed (133-4)65
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:09 P.M.