SB0232

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy

Sponsored by:

Senator Manno

Status:

Veto sustained (0-44)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20171/20/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
2/9/20172/9/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/20172/13/2017Favorable with Amendments {804934/1 Report Adopted22
Second Reading Passed with Amendments22
2/15/20172/15/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)24
House2/15/20172/15/2017First Reading Ways and Means26
3/1/20173/1/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20173/29/2017Favorable with Amendments {855560/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/6/20173/30/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (122-18)64
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (47-0)62
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/26/20175/26/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate1/12/20181/12/2018Veto sustained (0-44)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 12, 2018 3:29 P.M.