SB0276 (CH0156)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Death Penalty Repeal - Substitution of Life Without the Possibility of Parole

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/18/20131/18/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25/20132/25/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Favorable with Amendments {258274/132
Special Order until 2/27 (Senator Frosh) Adopted 32
2/27/20132/27/2013Favorable with Amendments {258274/134B
Laid Over (Senator Raskin) Adopted34B
2/28/20132/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {258274/135
Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Raskin) Adopted 35
3/1/20133/1/2013Favorable with Amendments {258274/136
Committee Amendment (#2) Adopted (27-19)36
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted (33-13)36
Committee Amendment (#3) Adopted (46-0)36
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted36
Floor Amendment (Senator Colburn) {933922/1 Rejected (19-27)36
3/4/20133/4/2013Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {883426/1 Rejected (19-27)37
Floor Amendment (Senator Shank) {333725/1 Rejected (19-27)37
Floor Amendment (Senator Shank) {193825/1 Rejected (17-24)37
Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {983728/1 Rejected (19-25)37
Floor Amendment (Senator Brochin) {993129/2 Rejected (14-31)37
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {973620/1 Rejected (19-27)37
Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {353520/1 Rejected (19-27)37
Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {203322/1 Rejected (20-25)37
Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Raskin) Adopted 37
3/5/20133/5/2013Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {243321/1 Rejected (19-25)38
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {273327/1 Rejected (19-25)38
Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {753828/1 Withdrawn38
Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {933726/2 Rejected (15-31)38
Floor Amendment (Senator Getty) {863821/1 Rejected (21-24)38
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {773623/1 Rejected (11-32)38
Second Reading Passed with Amendments38
3/6/20133/6/2013Third Reading Passed (27-20)39
House3/7/20133/7/2013First Reading Judiciary42
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/08 at 12:30 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable Report Adopted45
Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted 45
3/13/20133/13/2013Floor Amendment (Delegate Wilson) {493426/146A
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted46A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Wilson) Rejected (61-77)46A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Smigiel) {383526/2 Rejected (57-79)46A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Smigiel) {933822/1 Rejected (51-85)46A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Cluster) {383625/2 Rejected (60-79)46A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Vitale) {533527/1 Rejected (57-79)46A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Hogan) {923921/1 Rejected (50-86)46A
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDermott) {673524/2 Rejected (50-85)46A
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {903927/1 Rejected (55-80)46A
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {823628/1 Rejected (53-82)46A
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {483222/1 Rejected (57-78)46A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Schuh) {423427/1 Rejected (56-78)46A
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDermott) {123925/1 Rejected (55-79)46A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) {333728/3 Rejected (57-78)46A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) {673628/1 Rejected (52-82)46A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) {913929/1 Rejected (54-83)46A
Floor Amendment (Delegate McComas) {383427/2 Rejected (51-86)46A
Floor Amendment (Delegate Smigiel) {803520/2 Rejected (54-82)46A
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDermott) {203022/1 Rejected (50-87)46A
Second Reading Passed46A
3/15/20133/15/2013Motion vote previous question (Delegate Oaks) Rejected48
Third Reading Passed (82-56)48
Senate3/18/20133/16/2013Returned Passed47
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:07 P.M.