SB0304

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Taxpayer Protection Act

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

In the Senate - Passed Enrolled


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20171/20/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable with Amendments {299335/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/17/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)46
House3/17/20173/14/2017First Reading Judiciary48
3/18/20173/18/2017Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
4/7/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {592112/1 Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed with Amendments65
4/10/20174/4/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (141-0)69
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments63A
Third Reading Passed (46-0)63A
Passed Enrolled63A

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 11, 2017 2:04 P.M.