SB0361

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2017

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

Veto sustained (0-44)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/25/20171/25/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
2/21/20172/21/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
3/6/20173/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable with Amendments {149639/138
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted38
3/8/20173/8/2017Favorable with Amendments {149639/1 Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed with Amendments39
3/10/20173/10/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)41
House3/10/20173/10/2017First Reading Ways and Means43
3/13/20173/13/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/30/20173/30/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/30/20173/26/2017Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
3/31/20173/27/2017Third Reading Passed (134-4)61
Senate4/3/20173/28/2017Returned Passed57
Post Passage5/26/20175/26/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate1/12/20181/12/2018Veto sustained (0-44)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 12, 2018 3:29 P.M.