SB0452 (CH0731)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Accountability Program - Assessments (More Learning, Less Testing Act of 2017)

Sponsored by:

Senator Manno

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/30/20171/30/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {824533/1 Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/16/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)45
House3/16/20173/13/2017First Reading Ways and Means47
3/17/20173/17/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20173/29/2017Favorable with Amendments {605167/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/6/20173/30/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)64
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (47-0)62
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:11 P.M.