SB0946

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Gun-Free Higher Education Zones

Sponsored by:

Senator Smith

Status:

In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Favorable with Amendments {878776/146
Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Edwards) Adopted 46
3/20/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments {878776/1 Report Adopted46A
Floor Amendment {163423/1 (Senator Edwards)46A
Laid Over (Senator Edwards) Adopted46A
3/21/20173/19/2017Floor Amendment {163423/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected (22-24)48
Floor Amendment {113720/1 (Senator Edwards) Adopted48
Floor Amendment {713625/1 (Senator Eckardt)48
Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Eckardt) Adopted 48
3/22/20173/20/2017Floor Amendment {713625/1 (Senator Eckardt)49
Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Smith) Adopted 49
3/23/20173/21/2017Floor Amendment {713625/1 (Senator Eckardt) Withdrawn50
Floor Amendment {623022/4 (Senator Smith) Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/24/20173/22/2017Third Reading Passed (27-20)51
House3/24/20173/21/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations55
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Appropriations
4/4/20174/4/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable with Amendments {104463/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/7/20173/31/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (85-53)65
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments62
Senate Requests House Recede62
Conference Committee Appointed62
Senators Smith, Brochin, and Norman62

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2017 10:12 A.M.