SB1064 (CH0553)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Academic Facilities Bonding Authority

Sponsored by:

Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/7/20182/7/2018First Reading Senate Rules
2/12/20182/12/2018Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
2/14/20182/14/2018Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2/21/20182/21/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20183/6/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m.
3/7/20183/7/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
3/19/20183/19/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/19/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments {169030/1 Report Adopted48B
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48B
3/20/20183/18/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)49
House3/21/20183/17/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations51
3/22/20183/23/2018Rereferred to Appropriations
3/23/20183/23/2018Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20184/4/2018Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/4/20183/26/2018Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/6/20183/29/2018Third Reading Passed (136-0)63
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:36 P.M.