SB1090 (CH0341)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment

Sponsored by:

Senator Peters

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/12/20182/12/2018First Reading Senate Rules
2/15/20182/16/2018Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
2/16/20182/16/2018Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20183/19/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/19/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments {409330/1 Report Adopted48B
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48B
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (42-5)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Ways and Means50
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {795360/1 Report Adopted61A
Floor Committee Amendment {175661/1 Adopted61A
Floor Amendment {863828/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (65-67)61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/6/20183/28/2018Floor Amendment {563228/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (47-84)62
Floor Amendment {703227/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (50-81)62
Floor Amendment {703227/2 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (53-76)62
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (88-44)62
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (39-6)64
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:58 P.M.