Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session



Motor Vehicles - Special Registration Plates - Confederate Battle Flag

Sponsored by:

Delegate Barve


In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.

ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
1/13/20161/13/2016First Reading Environment and Transportation
1/14/20161/14/2016Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
1/20/20161/20/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
2/22/20162/22/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2/23/20162/23/2016Favorable with Amendments {950517/1 Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed with Amendments30
2/25/20162/25/2016Third Reading Passed (133-6)32
Senate2/26/20162/26/2016First Reading Judicial Proceedings32
3/2/20163/2/2016Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions

October 24, 2017 4:56 P.M.