HB0016

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations

Sponsored by:

Delegate Arora

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House9/26/20129/26/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/6/20133/6/2013Favorable with Amendments {396280/1 Report Adopted41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/8/20133/8/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)43
Senate3/11/20133/11/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs42

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.