HB0034 (CH0347)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Government - Commemorative Month - German-American Heritage Month

Sponsored by:

Delegate Aumann

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House10/16/201210/16/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/16/20131/16/2013Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/6/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments {296488/1 Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed with Amendments65
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)66
Senate4/8/20134/3/2013First Reading Senate Rules65
4/8/20134/8/2013Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/8/20134/6/2013Favorable with Amendments {664335/1 Report Adopted68
Second Reading Passed with Amendments68
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted68
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1)68
House4/8/20134/5/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments69
Third Reading Passed (135-2)69
Passed Enrolled69
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 12:59 P.M.