HB0060

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Conduct (Lynette's Law)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Smigiel

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House11/15/201211/15/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/16/20131/16/2013Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing cancelled
Rereferred to Judiciary
1/24/20131/24/2013Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments {462511/1 Report Adopted40
Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 40
3/7/20133/7/2013Floor Committee Amendment {732419/1 Adopted42
Second Reading Passed with Amendments42
3/12/20133/12/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)45
Senate3/13/20133/13/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings44
3/22/20133/22/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:05 P.M.