HB0067

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Self-Defense - Duty to Retreat

Sponsored by:

Delegate Conaway

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House8/28/20138/28/2013Pre-filed
1/8/20141/8/2014First Reading Judiciary
1/1/20141/1/2014Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
1/17/20141/17/2014Hearing cancelled
2/10/20142/10/2014Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:48 P.M.