HB0071

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495;Item ZA00(I) - Maryland Hall for the Creative Arts - Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2016


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20151/23/2015First Reading Appropriations
3/30/20153/30/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/30/20153/26/2015Favorable with Amendments56
Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 56
4/1/20153/28/2015Favorable with Amendments58
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted58
Committee Amendment (#2-5) Adopted58
Committee Amendment (#6-14) Adopted58
Committee Amendment (#15-27) Adopted58
Committee Amendment (#28-47)58
Committee Amendment (#28-39) Adopted58
Committee Amendment (#40) Adopted58
Committee Amendment (#41-47) Adopted58
Committee Amendment (#48-116) Adopted58
Committee Amendment (#117-125) Adopted58
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed with Amendments58
4/2/20153/29/2015Third Reading Passed (129-10)59
Senate4/3/20153/29/2015First Reading Senate Rules56
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator DeGrange) Adopted56
Referred Budget and Taxation56
4/6/20154/6/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
4/6/20153/30/2015Favorable with Amendments57
Special Order until 4/8 (Senator DeGrange) Adopted 57
4/8/20154/1/2015Favorable with Amendments59
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted59
Committee Amendment (#2-6) Adopted59
Committee Amendment (#7-10) Adopted59
Committee Amendment (#11-28) Adopted59
Committee Amendment (#29-36) Adopted59
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted59
Floor Amendment (Senator Bates) {113426/1 Rejected (15-32)59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator DeGrange) Adopted (47-0)59
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)59
House4/9/20154/3/2015House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments64
House Requests Senate Recede64
Conference Committee Appointed64
Delegates Jones, McIntosh, Gaines, Haynes, and Zucker64
House advisors:64
(Delegates Proctor and Beitzel)64
Senate4/9/20154/2/2015Senate Refuses to Recede60
Conference Committee Appointed60
Senators DeGrange, Kasemeyer, Peters, Currie, and Edwards60
Senate advisors:60
(Senators Madaleno and McFadden)60
House4/13/20154/9/2015Conference Committee Report Adopted70
Third Reading Passed (125-14)70
Senate4/13/20154/8/2015Conference Committee Report Adopted66
Third Reading Passed (47-0)66
House4/13/20154/9/2015Passed Enrolled66
Post Passage5/22/20155/22/2015Vetoed in part by the Governor (Policy)
5/31/20155/31/2015Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 495 (Line Item Veto)
House1/13/20161/13/2016Motion Special Order vote on line item veto until 1/20/2016 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
1/20/20161/20/2016Line item veto overridden (92-49)
Senate1/21/20161/21/2016Line item veto overridden (32-14)
Post Passage1/21/20161/21/2016Item ZA00(I) - Maryland Hall for the Creative Arts - Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2016

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:40 P.M.