HB0072 (CH0609)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Development and Implementation

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/14/20161/14/2016First Reading Ways and Means
1/20/20161/20/2016Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
2/22/20162/22/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2/23/20162/23/2016Favorable with Amendments {135267/1 Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed with Amendments30
2/25/20162/25/2016Third Reading Passed (133-6)32
Senate2/26/20162/26/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs32
2/29/20162/29/2016Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20163/28/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/20163/24/2016Favorable Report Adopted53
Second Reading Passed53
3/29/20163/25/2016Third Reading Passed (44-0)54
House3/30/20163/25/2016Returned Passed57
Post Passage5/19/20165/19/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:57 P.M.