HB0078

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption

Sponsored by:

Delegate Simmons

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/14/20131/14/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/16/20131/16/2013Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
1/18/20131/18/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {792616/1 Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed with Amendments30
2/21/20132/21/2013Third Reading Passed (133-0)32
Senate2/22/20132/22/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings31

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.