HB0130

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race Course

Sponsored by:

Delegate Beidle

Status:

In the House - Returned Passed


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/15/20181/15/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/17/20181/17/2018Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
2/19/20182/19/2018Favorable Report by Ways and Means
2/20/20182/20/2018Favorable Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed30
2/22/20182/22/2018Third Reading Passed (134-0)32
Senate2/23/20182/23/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation33
3/14/20183/14/2018Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20184/4/2018Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed (42-1)63
House4/6/20183/29/2018Returned Passed63

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 6, 2018 5:43 P.M.