HB0134

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore City - 46th District - Class B Location Restrictions - Limited Exemption

Sponsored by:

Delegate McHale

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/17/20131/17/2013First Reading Economic Matters
1/22/20131/22/2013Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20133/7/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/8/20133/8/2013Favorable Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed43
3/12/20133/12/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)45
Senate3/13/20133/13/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs44

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.