HB0153 (CH0032)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20171/18/2017First Reading Appropriations
2/15/20172/15/2017Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable Report by Appropriations
3/17/20173/14/2017Favorable Report Adopted48
Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 48
3/18/20173/15/2017Second Reading Passed49
3/20/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (130-0)50
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation46A
3/24/20173/24/2017Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20173/29/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/30/20173/26/2017Favorable Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed55
3/31/20173/27/2017Third Reading Passed (44-0)56
House3/31/20173/27/2017Returned Passed61
Post Passage4/11/20174/11/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:58 P.M.