HB0192

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Courts - Service of Process - Increase in Sheriff's Fees - Distribution to Rental Allowance Program Fund

Sponsored by:

Delegate Mitchell

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/21/20131/21/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
1/29/20131/29/2013Hearing cancelled
1/30/20131/30/2013Reassigned to Judiciary16
1/31/20131/31/2013Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.