HB0193 (CH0374)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption

Sponsored by:

Chair, Economic Matters Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20181/18/2018First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
1/26/20181/26/2018Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
3/7/20183/7/2018Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/8/20183/8/2018Favorable Report Adopted42
Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Rey) Adopted 42
3/13/20183/10/2018Second Reading Passed44
3/14/20183/11/2018Third Reading Passed (133-0)45
Senate3/15/20183/15/2018First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Finance
4/2/20183/28/2018Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20183/29/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)60
House4/4/20183/26/2018Returned Passed60
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.