HB0250 (CH0363)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Remedy and Priority of Restitution

Sponsored by:

Delegate Smigiel

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments {102311/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/7/20133/7/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)42
Senate3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings41
3/22/20133/22/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.