HB0251 (CH0736)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Boundaries and Consent

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kelly

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 736


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/19/20181/19/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/25/20181/25/2018Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
1/30/20181/30/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2/22/20182/22/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2/23/20182/23/2018Favorable with Amendments {585569/1 Report Adopted33
Second Reading Passed with Amendments33
2/27/20182/27/2018Third Reading Passed (117-17)35
Senate2/28/20182/28/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs36
3/30/20183/30/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/20183/27/2018Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)59
House4/3/20183/25/2018Returned Passed59
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 736

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:17 P.M.