HB0252

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Jane Lawton Farm-to-School Program - Maryland Homegrown School Lunch Week - Occurrence

Sponsored by:

Delegate Waldstreicher

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/4/20152/4/2015First Reading Environment and Transportation
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
3/9/20153/9/2015Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
3/10/20153/10/2015Favorable Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed40
3/12/20153/12/2015Third Reading Passed (132-4)42
Senate3/13/20153/13/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs42
4/3/20154/3/2015Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:41 P.M.