HB0262

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Distribution of Faked Controlled Dangerous Substance - Substantially Similar Chemical Structure

Sponsored by:

Delegate Haddaway-Riccio

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable Report Adopted30
Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate Vitale) Adopted 30
2/20/20132/20/2013Floor Amendment (Delegate Vitale) {313126/231
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted31
Floor Amendment (Delegate Vitale) Rejected (39-97)31
Second Reading Passed31
2/22/20132/22/2013Third Reading Passed (133-2)33
Senate2/25/20132/25/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings32

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.