HB0263 (CH0683)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies - Repeal and Notification Requirement

Sponsored by:

Delegate Carr

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 683


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20171/23/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation
1/25/20171/25/2017Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/09 at 1:15 p.m.
3/18/20173/18/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/18/20173/15/2017Favorable with Amendments {210018/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/20/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (130-3)50
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings46A
3/21/20173/21/2017Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/10/20174/3/2017Favorable63A
Special Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 63A
Favorable Report Adopted63A
Second Reading Passed63A
4/10/20174/4/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)64
House4/10/20174/5/2017Returned Passed70
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 683

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:59 P.M.