HB0267

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Crimes - Adultery - Repeal

Sponsored by:

Delegate Dumais

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/19/20181/19/2018First Reading Judiciary
1/18/20181/18/2018Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2/12/20182/12/2018Favorable Report by Judiciary
2/14/20182/14/2018Favorable Report Adopted26
Second Reading Passed26
2/16/20182/16/2018Third Reading Passed (87-49)28
Senate2/19/20182/19/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings29
2/28/20182/28/2018Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/1/20183/1/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 1, 2018 5:08 P.M.