HB0270 (CH0386)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Environment - Testing for Lead in Drinking Water - Public and Nonpublic Schools

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lafferty

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20171/23/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
1/25/20171/25/2017Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
3/20/20173/20/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/20/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments {690012/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/20/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (117-23)51
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20173/29/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/10/20174/3/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)63A
House4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed69
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:59 P.M.