HB0271 (CH0024)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - Repeal

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lierman

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20171/23/2017First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
1/25/20171/25/2017Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
3/6/20173/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable with Amendments {714968/1 Report Adopted40
Floor Amendment {183829/1 (Delegate Flanagan)40
Laid Over (Delegate Flanagan) Adopted40
3/8/20173/8/2017Floor Amendment {183829/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (48-87)41
Floor Amendment {893421/1 (Delegate Krebs)41
Laid Over (Delegate Krebs) Adopted41
3/9/20173/9/2017Floor Amendment {893421/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (49-87)42
Second Reading Passed with Amendments42
3/15/20173/12/2017Third Reading Passed (85-50)46A
Senate3/16/20173/16/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation45
3/21/20173/21/2017Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20173/24/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/24/20173/22/2017Favorable Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed51
3/27/20173/23/2017Third Reading Passed (31-15)52
House3/27/20173/22/2017Returned Passed56
Post Passage4/6/20174/6/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 6, 2017 10:49 A.M.