HB0278 (CH0411)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education Program

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kaiser

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/4/20152/4/2015First Reading Ways and Means
2/5/20152/5/2015Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/9/20153/9/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/10/20153/10/2015Favorable with Amendments {795262/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/12/20153/12/2015Third Reading Passed (136-0)42
Senate3/13/20153/13/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs42
4/9/20154/9/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20154/3/2015Favorable with Amendments {364933/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/11/20154/4/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)62
House4/13/20154/7/2015House Concur - Senate Amendments68
Third Reading Passed (138-0)68
Passed Enrolled68
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:41 P.M.