HB0281 (CH0358)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Computer Science - Curriculum and Professional Development (Securing the Future: Computer Science Education for All)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Miller, A.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/19/20181/19/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/25/20181/25/2018Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2/26/20182/26/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2/27/20182/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {285465/1 Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed with Amendments35
3/1/20183/1/2018Third Reading Passed (135-1)37
Senate3/2/20183/2/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs38
3/15/20183/15/2018Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments {884035/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments61A
House Requests Senate Recede61A
Conference Committee Appointed61A
Delegates Luedtke, M. Washington, and Afzali61A
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Motion Recede (Senator Pinsky) Adopted64
Committee Amendment {884035/1 Withdrawn64
Senate Recede64
Third Reading Passed (44-0)64
House4/9/20184/2/2018Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.