HB0287 (CH0665)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2017

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hixson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 665


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20171/23/2017First Reading Ways and Means
1/26/20171/26/2017Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2/16/20172/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2/17/20172/17/2017Favorable with Amendments {635469/1 Report Adopted28
Second Reading Passed with Amendments28
2/21/20172/21/2017Third Reading Passed (127-10)30
Senate2/22/20172/22/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs29
3/8/20173/8/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
3/29/20173/29/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/30/20173/26/2017Favorable Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed55
3/31/20173/27/2017Third Reading Passed (44-0)56
House3/31/20173/27/2017Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 665

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 25, 2017 12:51 P.M.