HB0294

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Firearm Safety Act of 2013

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
2/8/20132/8/2013Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
2/26/20132/25/2013Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)
2/25/20132/25/2013Hearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
2/27/20132/27/2013Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:05 P.M.