HB0296

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Correctional Officers

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hixson

Status:

In the House - Passed Enrolled


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/22/20181/22/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/24/20181/24/2018Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {995769/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (131-0)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {989134/1 Report Adopted62A
Floor Amendment {863225/2 (Senator Peters) Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)63
House4/7/20183/30/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (138-0)64
Passed Enrolled

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 7, 2018 2:39 P.M.