HB0309 (CH0070)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Anne Arundel County - Practice of Massage - Regulation

Sponsored by:

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/22/20181/22/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/24/20181/24/2018Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
1/25/20181/25/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20182/20/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2/21/20182/21/2018Favorable with Amendments {916184/1 Report Adopted31
Second Reading Passed with Amendments31
2/23/20182/23/2018Third Reading Passed (131-0)33
Senate2/26/20182/26/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs34
3/15/20183/15/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018Returned Passed61
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 1:00 P.M.