HB0327 (CH0572)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lisanti

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/22/20181/22/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/24/20181/24/2018Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2/5/20182/5/2018Hearing canceled
2/8/20182/8/2018Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {615568/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (133-0)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {339836/1 Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)63
House4/7/20183/30/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (138-0)64
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:16 P.M.